TX HR1979 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Alexandra Babino of Central Elementary School on being named Educator of the Year by the Lewisville Area Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Congratulating Alexandra Babino of Central Elementary School on being named Educator of the Year by the Lewisville Area Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Simmons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |