TX HR1941 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 30, 2015, as Williamson County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 30, 2015, as Williamson County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WILLIAMSON COUNTY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WILLIAMSON COUNTY DAY