TX HR1837 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the City of Brownsville on setting the Guinness World Record for largest huapango dance.
Title
Congratulating the City of Brownsville on setting the Guinness World Record for largest huapango dance.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-30 | House | Filed |