TX HR1792 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Karen Holburn on her election to the Richardson ISD Board of Trustees.
Title
Congratulating Karen Holburn on her election to the Richardson ISD Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-11 | Adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-04 | Filed |