TX HR1749 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Julian Jones on his selection as the 2024 Secondary Teacher of the Year in the Round Rock Independent School District.
Title
Congratulating Julian Jones on his selection as the 2024 Secondary Teacher of the Year in the Round Rock Independent School District.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-12 | House | Filed |