TX HR1703 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kelton Brown and Wade Bryant of Amarillo High School on winning the 5A boys' doubles championship at the 2023 UIL Tennis State Tournament.
Title
Congratulating Kelton Brown and Wade Bryant of Amarillo High School on winning the 5A boys' doubles championship at the 2023 UIL Tennis State Tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Filed |