TX HR1668 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Alexis Ruiz on graduating as the salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Bishop High School.
Title
Congratulating Alexis Ruiz on graduating as the salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Bishop High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Filed |