TX HR166 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Katy Independent School District on being ranked by Niche.com as one of the top school districts in the Houston area.
Title
Congratulating the Katy Independent School District on being ranked by Niche.com as one of the top school districts in the Houston area.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schofield [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |