TX HR1657 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dylan Fairley of Lumberton High School on being named the 2019 Super Gold Boys' Soccer Coach of the Year by the Beaumont Enterprise.
Title
Congratulating Dylan Fairley of Lumberton High School on being named the 2019 Super Gold Boys' Soccer Coach of the Year by the Beaumont Enterprise.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed |