TX HR1611 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Endeavors on its 50th anniversary and on the 15th anniversary of its Fairweather Family Lodge in San Antonio.
Title
Congratulating Endeavors on its 50th anniversary and on the 15th anniversary of its Fairweather Family Lodge in San Antonio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-10 | House | Filed |