TX HR1605 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 16, 2019, as American Heritage Girls Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing May 16, 2019, as American Heritage Girls Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-10 | House | Filed |