TX HR1591 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating James and La Donna Johns of Van on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating James and La Donna Johns of Van on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-18 | House | Filed |