TX HR155 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Audra Dannette Rauh, salutatorian of the Class of 2013 at River Road High School in Amarillo.
Title
Congratulating Audra Dannette Rauh, salutatorian of the Class of 2013 at River Road High School in Amarillo.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-19 | House | Filed |