TX HR1522 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Noah Sekinger of Vela High School on being named the Boys Basketball Player of the Year by the Monitor newspaper.
Title
Congratulating Noah Sekinger of Vela High School on being named the Boys Basketball Player of the Year by the Monitor newspaper.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Filed |