TX HR1475 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Roxana Ybarra of Robert Driscoll Elementary School on her selection as a 2016-2017 Robstown Independent School District Elementary Teacher of the Year finalist.
Title
Congratulating Roxana Ybarra of Robert Driscoll Elementary School on her selection as a 2016-2017 Robstown Independent School District Elementary Teacher of the Year finalist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-17 | House | Filed |