TX HR147 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 2011 CowParade in Austin benefiting the Dell Children's Medical Center of Central Texas.
Title
Commemorating the 2011 CowParade in Austin benefiting the Dell Children's Medical Center of Central Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-24 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-20 | Filed |