TX HR139 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Mundy Ingalls Peale, Jr., of Lake Kiowa.
Title
In memory of Mundy Ingalls Peale, Jr., of Lake Kiowa.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-17 | Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-01-18 | Filed |