TX HR1379 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Madeleine Suzan Stratton on the seventh anniversary of her open heart surgery.
Title
Honoring Madeleine Suzan Stratton on the seventh anniversary of her open heart surgery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed |