TX HR1379 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Angela Grisham of Sour Lake for saving the life of a choking child with the Heimlich maneuver.
Title
Congratulating Angela Grisham of Sour Lake for saving the life of a choking child with the Heimlich maneuver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-16 | Filed |