TX HR1376 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Bob Townsend on his retirement as mayor of Richardson.
Title
Congratulating Bob Townsend on his retirement as mayor of Richardson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed |