TX HR1361 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Antonio Campos of Houston on the occasion of his 103rd birthday.
Title
Congratulating Antonio Campos of Houston on the occasion of his 103rd birthday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-15 | Filed |