TX HR1350 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Honorable Delwin T. McGee on his retirement as judge of the Moore County Court at Law.
Title
Congratulating the Honorable Delwin T. McGee on his retirement as judge of the Moore County Court at Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Filed |