TX HR1332 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring the life of Trammell Crow of Dallas.
Title
Honoring the life of Trammell Crow of Dallas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-16 | Adopted | |
2009-04-16 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-14 | Filed |