TX HR130 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Honorable Judge Terri Tipton Holder on her retirement as judge of the 149th District Court.
Title
Congratulating the Honorable Judge Terri Tipton Holder on her retirement as judge of the 149th District Court.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-02 | House | Adopted |
2021-09-02 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-09-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-08-31 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-30 | House | Filed |