TX HR1259 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Chandler Skolnick for his service as committee clerk for the House Public Education Committee during the 86th Legislative Session.
Title
Commending Chandler Skolnick for his service as committee clerk for the House Public Education Committee during the 86th Legislative Session.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Filed |