TX HR1238 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring associate professor Lisa Elliott for her contributions to El Paso Community College.
Title
Honoring associate professor Lisa Elliott for her contributions to El Paso Community College.
Sponsors
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Filed |