TX HR1221 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the 2022 Texas Commission on the Arts honorees.
Title
Congratulating the 2022 Texas Commission on the Arts honorees.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON THE ARTS HONOREES, TEXAS
POET LAUREATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
STATE ARTIST
STATE MUSICIAN
POET LAUREATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
STATE ARTIST
STATE MUSICIAN