TX HR1217 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Paulo Hernandez of the Corpus Christi Police Department on his promotion to lieutenant.
Title
Congratulating Paulo Hernandez of the Corpus Christi Police Department on his promotion to lieutenant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed |