TX HR121 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing January 30, 2019, as Laredo Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing January 30, 2019, as Laredo Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-01-30 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LAREDO DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates