TX HR121 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Clint Dempsey of the United States Men's National Team on his performance at the 2014 FIFA World Cup in Brazil
Title
Honoring Clint Dempsey of the United States Men's National Team on his performance at the 2014 FIFA World Cup in Brazil
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-01-06 | House | Filed |