TX HR1197 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the dedication of an Official Texas Historical Marker at Rancho San Jose de la Mulada in Starr County.
Title
Commemorating the dedication of an Official Texas Historical Marker at Rancho San Jose de la Mulada in Starr County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-13 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-13 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |