TX HR1184 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Chris Howell on his receipt of a 2017 Quest for Success award.
Title
Congratulating Chris Howell on his receipt of a 2017 Quest for Success award.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed |