TX HR1178 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Vista Hills Elementary School principal Judith Calderon for her contributions to education in the El Paso community.
Title
Honoring Vista Hills Elementary School principal Judith Calderon for her contributions to education in the El Paso community.
Sponsors
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Filed |