TX HR1113 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Dr. Mary Ellen Weber of The University of Texas Southwestern Medical Center in Dallas for her achievements.
Title
Honoring Dr. Mary Ellen Weber of The University of Texas Southwestern Medical Center in Dallas for her achievements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-02 | Adopted | |
2009-04-02 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-27 | Filed |