TX HR1060 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Michael Turner on his graduation from the Justin Community Volunteer Fire Department Academy.
Title
Congratulating Michael Turner on his graduation from the Justin Community Volunteer Fire Department Academy.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-09 | Adopted | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |