TX HR1054 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Matt Russell for his service as principal of Allen High School in the Allen Independent School District.
Title
Commending Matt Russell for his service as principal of Allen High School in the Allen Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-10 | House | Filed |