TX HR1052 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Chandice Covington of Lubbock on her appointment as the Florence Thelma Hall Endowed Chair for Nursing Excellence in Women's Health at the Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center.
Title
Congratulating Chandice Covington of Lubbock on her appointment as the Florence Thelma Hall Endowed Chair for Nursing Excellence in Women's Health at the Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-09 | Adopted | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |