TX HJR82 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of and use of money in the Grow Texas fund and allocating certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of and use of money in the Grow Texas fund and allocating certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - Adopted RV#999 (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Finance
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#999
2021-05-12HouseAdopted
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR21 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Appropriations

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback