TX HJR81 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to permit certain political subdivisions to adopt a temporary limitation on the appraised value for taxation of certain real property located in specified areas.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to permit certain political subdivisions to adopt a temporary limitation on the appraised value for taxation of certain real property located in specified areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1577 (Enabled by) 2021-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions