TX HJR81 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the flood infrastructure fund to assist in the financing of drainage, flood mitigation, and flood control projects.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the flood infrastructure fund to assist in the financing of drainage, flood mitigation, and flood control projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR51 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
HB13 (Enabled by) 2019-05-16 - No action taken in committee
HB478 (Enabled by) 2019-03-05 - Left pending in committee
HB13 (Enabled by) 2019-05-16 - No action taken in committee
HB478 (Enabled by) 2019-03-05 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
FLOODS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
FLOODS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR81 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00081I.htm |