TX HJR73 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to restrict the power of the legislature to mandate requirements on a municipality or county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to restrict the power of the legislature to mandate requirements on a municipality or county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - House - Adopted RV#1153 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1120 (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HouseAdopted
2017-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback