TX HJR3 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide property tax relief by reducing school district maintenance and operations ad valorem tax rates and increasing the state sales and use tax rates.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide property tax relief by reducing school district maintenance and operations ad valorem tax rates and increasing the state sales and use tax rates.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4621 (Enabled by) 2019-05-07 - Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District