TX HB4621 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the state sales tax rate and the use of certain revenue from state sales and use taxes to reduce school district maintenance and operations ad valorem tax rates; increasing the rate of a tax.
Title
Relating to the state sales tax rate and the use of certain revenue from state sales and use taxes to reduce school district maintenance and operations ad valorem tax rates; increasing the rate of a tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR3 (Enabling for) 2019-05-07 - Postponed 1/12/21 12:00 PM
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District