TX HJR114 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of general obligation bonds to be paid out of the economic stabilization fund by the Texas Water Development Board to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions for projects related to disaster recovery; disaster mitigation; disaster response; or construct, repair, rehabilitate, or reconstruct state or local infrastructure.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of general obligation bonds to be paid out of the economic stabilization fund by the Texas Water Development Board to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions for projects related to disaster recovery; disaster mitigation; disaster response; or construct, repair, rehabilitate, or reconstruct state or local infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4279 (Enabled by) 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
SJR75 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
SJR75 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Subjects
BONDS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Political Subdivisions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Political Subdivisions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR114 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00114I.htm |