TX HCR90 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Texas Chili Parlor in Austin.
Title
Honoring the Texas Chili Parlor in Austin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Filed |