TX HCR17 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Congratulating His Eminence, Daniel Cardinal DiNardo, Archbishop of Galveston-Houston.
Title
Congratulating His Eminence, Daniel Cardinal DiNardo, Archbishop of Galveston-Houston.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Ruth McClendon [D] |
Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-01-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-01-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-01-22 | Signed in the House | |
2009-01-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-01-15 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-01-14 | Read & adopted | |
2009-01-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-01-13 | Adopted | |
2009-01-13 | Laid before the House | |
2009-01-08 | Filed |