TX HCR163 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Convening a joint memorial session to honor Texans killed while serving in the Global War on Terrorism, commemorating Memorial Day 2011, and paying tribute to all those who have died in the service of the United States.
Title
Convening a joint memorial session to honor Texans killed while serving in the Global War on Terrorism, commemorating Memorial Day 2011, and paying tribute to all those who have died in the service of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Adopted | |
2011-05-23 | Read | |
2011-05-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-16 | Adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-13 | Filed |
Subjects
MEMORIAL DAY
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Memorial
TEXANS KILLED DURING GLOBAL WAR ON TERRORISM
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Memorial
TEXANS KILLED DURING GLOBAL WAR ON TERRORISM