TX HCR139 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Ed Speakmon of Keller.
Title
In memory of Ed Speakmon of Keller.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed |