TX HCR133 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-03 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-03 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Honoring Calvin Nelson Clyde, Jr., of Tyler on his 88th birthday.
Title
Honoring Calvin Nelson Clyde, Jr., of Tyler on his 88th birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-03-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-03-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-03-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-26 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-03-25 | Read & adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Received from the House | |
2009-03-25 | Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |