TX HCR131 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Bastrop County as the official Film Hospitality Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Title
Designating Bastrop County as the official Film Hospitality Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Adopted RV#1034 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1034 |
2019-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-07 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BASTROP COUNTY
FILM HOSPITALITY CAPITAL OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
FILM HOSPITALITY CAPITAL OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals